Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Muston, Matthew Stuart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Muston, Jennifer Kristen, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree Of Divorce (I) |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter to Judge | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Counterpetion Respondent's Original Answer |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter In Re: The Marriage of Matthew Muston and Jennifer Muston |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Answer to Divorce |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.