Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Nelda Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Ismael, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Amended Final Decree of Divorce |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce /I |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting: 4/17/14 @ 9:00AM /I | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.