Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Puebla, Reynaldo, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Puebla, Alberto, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal without Prejudice (Imaged) | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order (I) | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/walkd to court by esmer | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order (I) | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/order attached, walked to court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.