Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Veltman, Mark, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Veltman, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Hearing For Temporary Orders |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Domestic Relations Order Dividing Retirement Plan Benefits (Teacher Retirement System) |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Private Retirement Plan - Defined Contribution) |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Amended Final Decree of Divorce /I |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice letter from Michael O'Reilly to Judge Longoria |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Mediation for Settlement Agreement | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Reform Style of Case/Walked Up | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order On Motion To Reform Style Of The Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.