Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Camou, Heidi Lea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Camou, David Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order I/Final Decree of Divorce |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Original Citation returned addressed to David Leonard Camou; Return of service not filled out properly; reciept attached regarding mailing out by reg. mail |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Substitute Service |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet service requested |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter to the court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.