Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Victor Alejandro, The State Of Texas - Attorney General, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Maria Guadalupe, Ponce, Eva, Ponce, Teodoro, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference (10:20 AM) () | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Other CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) () Other (1 Hour) |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1 Hour) |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Of Judgment |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.