Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jaramillo, Anita Teresa Andre, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cedillo, Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hernandez, Angelica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHernandez, Angelica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center / walked up by attorney |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting: Protective Order: 02/21/14 at 8:30am |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order / walked up by attorney |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order extending ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order/order attached, walked to court |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.