Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carmel Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jenkins, Jody D., against Hernandez, Deborah, Hernandez, Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment Imaged |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Retain case on Docket/E-filed | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Order Retaingin Case Docket/E-filed |
|
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment and Final Default Judgment attached |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.