Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walker, Kim M., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gonzalez, Hector P., against , Dubaeu, Kenny, Walter Investment Management Co., Green Tree Servicing Llc, represented by Culbreth, Kenneth M., Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Envelope Returned Undelivered addressed to Kenny Dubaeu |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail DWOP |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail D.W.O.P |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy and Suggestion of Stay | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Amended Defendants and Intervenors First Supplemental Application to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.