Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moore, Luz Amanda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carrigan, Stephen P, Cook, Andrew C., against Hall-Astin, Andrea, Shoreline Surfside, Llc, Tandem Marketing Services, Inc. Dba Pier 99, Taylor, George K, Willis, Jerry, (total of 5) See All represented by Clancy, James, Stewart, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail DWOP Notice; Jerry Willis; Return to Sender; Unable to Forward |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail D.W.O.P |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice DWOP Notice Sent |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granting Defendants' Plea to the Jurisdiction | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Brief Supplemental Brief in Support of Plea to the Jurisdiction |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Brief Plaintiff Luz Amanda Moore's Supplemental Brief Responding to Defendant Shoreline Surfside, L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.