Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frie, Ana Christina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Frie, Bobby Don, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter to to the Judge |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal (I) | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DIVORCE TRIAL/DISMISSAL |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DIVORCE TRIAL/DISMISSAL |
|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DIVORCE TRIAL/DISMISSAL |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DIVORCE |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.