Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pizana, Stephanie Biance, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Connelly, Ryant Edgeorge, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Guy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Guy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for New Trial | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Photos 1-24 |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Protective Order |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order / walked up by Esmer |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) An Appiication for a Protective Order/walkd to court by Esmer |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.