Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Leslie Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Joshua Lee, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fee Voucher Michael D George- $1081.00 |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Application for Fee as Court-Appointed Attorney |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Commitment NPDC |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Apprehension Sheet - Description of Josh Davis |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested (NPDC Writ of Commitment) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit BAILIFF AFFIDAVIT |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Compliance Hearing (OCA) | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER HOLDING RESPONDANT IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT, GRANTING JUDGMENT, AND FOR COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Holding Respondent In Contempt For Failure To Pay Child Support, Granting Judgment, And For Commitment To County Jail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.