Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bowen, Madeline Corrin, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Sabatini, Louis Anthony, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Non-Suit/imaged |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit / walked up by Esmer |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Motion for Non-Suit / walked up by Esmer |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Texas Crime Information Center | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Imaged |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion To Extend Temporpary Ex Parte Protective Order **Walked To Court** | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order - Ex-Parte Order I/Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order & Order Setting Hearing 12/28 @ 1:30 PM |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) An Application For Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.