Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee Of Sears, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Adams, Michael J., against Sanchez, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Copy of Dismissal Order now mailed to their other office in Rockville, MD office ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-12-07 11:38:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-12-07 11:38:28.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Rec'd Pltf's atty's request for status on case....already Dismissed 10/14/09 & copy sent to Irving, Tx office back then ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-12-07 11:38:07.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-12-07 11:38:07.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Dismissal Order mailed to both parties ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:43.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Dismissed Without Prejudice ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:43.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 08/20/2009 09:30 AM: Dismissed without Prejudice ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:17.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-10-14 14:59:17.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 08/20/2009 09:30 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-06-19 14:40:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-06-19 14:40:27.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv No answer filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 14:00:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 14:00:09.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 13:59:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 13:59:59.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Christina Sanchez Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee $0.00 Served 5/15/2009......Rule 536 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 13:59:42.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-06-02 13:59:42.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.