Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conn Appliance Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Williams, Pamela D., against Ortiz, Nylvia A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Dismissed Without Prejudice on plaintiff's motion. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-05-21 15:17:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-05-21 15:17:11.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 03/13/2009 01:30 PM: Judgment entered dismissed without prejudice on plaintiff's motion. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-05-21 15:16:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-05-21 15:17:02.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 03/13/2009 01:30 PM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-03-04 15:49:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-03-04 15:49:06.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-13 16:15:32.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-13 16:15:32.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
January 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Nylvia A Ortiz Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 1/10/2009 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-13 16:15:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-13 16:15:27.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Civil Suit Paid by: Conn Appliances, Inc D/B/A Conn's (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0008781 Dated: 12/30/2008 Amount: $27.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:34:46.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:34:46.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Nylvia A Ortiz Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 12/30/2008 TO PCP-CLINT LOVEJOY FOR SERVICE. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:35:01.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:35:01.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service TO PCP-CLINT LOVEJOY FOR SERVICE. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:35:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-13 16:15:26.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:32:51.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-30 15:32:51.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.