Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gordon St Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Frances Tsesmelis And All Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Judgment to both parties in courtroom ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:44:48.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:45:23.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/07/2009 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:44:02.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:44:02.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/7/2009 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Frances Tsesmelis and All Occupants, Defendant; Gordon St Apts,, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:44:35.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:44:35.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 08:56:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH9099 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 08:56:36.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:26:13.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:26:13.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Constable Pct 2 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:28:16.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 08:56:18.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Frances Tsesmelis and All Occupants Assigned to Constable Service fee $70.00 Served 12/29/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 08:56:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH9099 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 08:56:19.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Gordon St Apts, (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0013972 Dated: 12/29/2008 Amount: $97.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:29:54.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:29:54.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/07/2009 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:29:04.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 11:29:04.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.