Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Obregon, Linda, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Don Orasen And All Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Judgment to both parties in courtroom ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:47:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:47:31.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/7/2009 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Orasen, Don, Defendant; Obregon, Linda, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:47:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:47:00.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/07/2009 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:46:32.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-07 15:46:32.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 09:01:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH9099 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 09:01:50.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/07/2009 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:02:17.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:02:17.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Don Orasen Assigned to Constable Service fee of $70.00 on 12/29/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:01:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:01:59.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Don Orasen Assigned to Constable Service fee $70.00 Served 12/29/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 09:01:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LH9099 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 09:01:31.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:00:25.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:00:25.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Constable Pct 2 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 09:01:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 09:01:29.0000000 LAST_USER: LH9099 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.