Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Patricia, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Holmes, Cynthia, Cheatham, Teneasha, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/05/2009 09:00 AM: Default Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 12:22:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 12:22:41.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/5/2009 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Cheatham, Teneasha, Defendant; Holmes, Cynthia, Defendant; Turner, Patricia, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 12:22:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 12:22:56.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned -Teneasha Cheatham ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:00:48.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:00:48.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned-Cynthia Holmes ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:02:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:02:18.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Teneasha Cheatham ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:00:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:01:02.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Eviction Paid by: Turner, Patricia (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0008745 Dated: 12/29/2008 Amount: $27.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:17:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:17:00.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Teneasha Cheatham Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 12/29/2008 Teneasha Cheatham ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:00:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-02 16:00:26.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Eviction Citation Issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:08:37.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:08:37.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/05/2009 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:17:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-29 14:17:21.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.