Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Williams, James, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Neblett, Duncan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeblett, Duncan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/5/2009 Judgment type: Agreed Judgment Disposition type: Agreed Judgment Parties on judgment: Williams, James, Defendant(in favor); Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.,, Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2010-01-15 12:00:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2010-01-15 12:00:19.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/05/2009 08:00 AM: Agreed Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 08:20:25.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-01-05 08:20:25.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee ans Service Fee Constable 4 Paid by: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp., (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0007415 Dated: 12/24/2008 Amount: $97.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:33:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:33:43.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 |
|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/05/2009 08:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:34:02.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:34:02.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:31:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-24 11:31:00.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.