Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bluff Manor Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Wiggins, Shannon, Long, Billy, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 12/12/2007 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff for $1,027.00 plus court costs, interest at 8.25% per annum and possession. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:46:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:46:27.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 12/12/2007 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Long, Billy, Defendant; Wiggins, Shannon, Defendant; Bluff Manor Apartments, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:47:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:47:40.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 12/12/2007 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:53.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:53.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Service Fee - Constable 2 Paid by: Bluff Manor Apartments (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005550 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $130.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:40.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Eviction Paid by: Bluff Manor Apartments (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005550 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:50:41.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:48:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 11:48:31.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Eviction Citation Issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:09:02.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:09:02.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.