Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seiger, Lon, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Fisher, Andre, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 12/12/2007 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Fisher, Andre, Defendant; Seiger, Lon, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:45:23.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:45:23.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 12/12/2007 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff for $900.00 plus court costs, interest at 8.25% per annum, and possession. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:44:32.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 14:44:32.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:30:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 08:48:17.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Andre Fisher Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 12/4/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 08:47:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 08:47:58.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Service Fee - Constable 2 Paid by: Seiger, Lon (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005525 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $65.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:19:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:19:08.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:30:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-12 08:47:57.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 12/12/2007 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:23:16.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:23:16.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Eviction Paid by: Seiger, Lon (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005525 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:19:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:19:09.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Andre Fisher Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 12/4/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:30:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 08:30:12.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.