Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Burke, Edward T., against Willis, Julie D, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 03/11/2008 10:00 AM: Default Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:53:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:53:19.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 3/11/2008 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Willis, Julie D, Defendant; Bank Of America, N.A. (USA), Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:54:35.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:54:35.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment mailed to both parties ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:54:49.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:54:49.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 03/11/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 13:59:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 13:59:50.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Hearing Notice mailed to Pltf's atty ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 14:00:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 15:05:58.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reminders answer date REMINDER_FOR: EH3966 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:57:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:57:52.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:40:23.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:40:23.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Julie D Willis Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee $0.00 Served 12/18/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:40:14.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 14:57:11.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Julie D Willis Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 12/5/2007 PCP-CC ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 16:28:39.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 16:28:39.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.