Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection, Llc Assignee Of Drive Financ, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Burford, Brent P, against Chavarria, Rico, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Woolsey, Jo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoolsey, Jo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Pltf's atty called for info ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-08-12 13:31:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-08-12 13:31:41.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Justice Civil Hearing 08/13/2008 11:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-07-09 10:45:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-07-09 10:45:21.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Certificate of Discovery ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-26 11:46:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-26 11:46:30.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Rico Chavarria Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee $0.00 Served 12/7/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:41:13.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:41:13.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:42:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:42:30.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Allen Civil Process ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:29:57.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:41:12.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter of representation from attorney Plaintiff: Palisades Collection, LLC Assignee of Drive Finan Letter of representation from attorney Brent P Burford ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:28:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:28:26.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Rico Chavarria Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 12/5/2007......Allen Civil Process ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:29:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 17:42:30.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Civil Suit Paid by: Burford, Brent P (attorney for Palisades Collection, LLC Assignee of Drive Finan) Receipt number: 0010004 Dated: 12/5/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:28:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-05 11:28:59.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.