Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hall, April, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Joe A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 12/13/2007 09:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:49:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:49:15.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 12/13/2007 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Hall, April, Defendant; Stronghouse Properties,, Other Party; Stronghouse Properties,, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:49:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:49:43.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:29:07.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:29:07.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 12/13/2007 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:30:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:30:52.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:48:45.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:48:45.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 1 Paid by: Stronghouse Properties, (other party) Receipt number: 0013759 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $82.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:33:17.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RS68141 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:33:17.0000000 LAST_USER: RS68141 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued April Hall Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 12/4/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:48:46.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 13:48:46.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.