Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc Assignee Of Ge Money, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Strong, Steven M., against Clark, Jose M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 02/08/2008 10:00 AM: Default Judgment for $1,718.05 plus court cost and interest at 8.55% per annum ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-10 13:49:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VG68121 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-10 13:49:08.0000000 LAST_USER: VG68121 |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/7/2008 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Clark, Jose M, Defendant; Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee Of GE Money, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-10 13:50:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VG68121 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-10 13:50:36.0000000 LAST_USER: VG68121 | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 02/08/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 09:23:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 09:23:40.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:42:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:42:11.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Jose M Clark Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 1/3/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:42:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:42:00.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service TO PCP-CLINT LOVEJOY FOR SERVICE. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-26 09:07:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:42:00.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Jose M Clark Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 12/26/2007 TO PCP-CLINT LOVEJOY FOR SERVICE. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-26 09:07:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-26 09:07:06.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter of representation from attorney Plaintiff: Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee Of GE Money Letter of representation from attorney Steven M. Strong ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:21:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:21:56.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:19:35.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 16:19:35.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.