Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peel, Christina M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Stickell, Vicky, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Abstract of Judgment Paid by: Peel, Christina M (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0019143 Dated: 3/12/2010 Amount: $5.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2010-03-12 14:16:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2010-03-12 14:16:50.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment mailed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:23:48.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:23:48.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 03/11/2008 10:00 AM: Default Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:40:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:40:27.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 3/11/2008 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Stickell, Vicky, Defendant; Peel, Christina M, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:23:29.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 11:23:29.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Hearing Notice mailed to Pltf ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 15:36:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 15:36:58.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
February 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 03/11/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 15:36:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-18 15:36:09.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reminders Answer date REMINDER_FOR: EH3966 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:50:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:50:34.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:50:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:50:08.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Vicky Stickell Assigned to Constable Service fee $45.00 Served 12/7/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:49:57.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-10 10:49:57.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.