Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delagarza, Roberto, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Villarreal, Alvaro, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Abstract of Judgment Paid by: Delagarza, Roberto (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0010943 Dated: 2/22/2008 Amount: $5.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:54:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:54:12.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/22/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Villarreal, Alvaro, Defendant; Delagarza, Roberto, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:19:42.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:19:42.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 02/22/2008 11:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:18:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-22 11:18:36.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 02/22/2008 11:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-28 16:47:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-28 16:47:41.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-19 08:55:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-19 08:55:12.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-07 16:07:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-07 16:07:15.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Alvaro Villarreal Assigned to Constable Service fee $45.00 Served 12/6/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-07 16:07:07.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-07 16:07:07.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 14:44:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 14:44:06.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Alvaro Villarreal Assigned to Constable Service fee of $45.00 on 12/4/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 14:46:10.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 14:46:10.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.