Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castro, Gina M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Henry, Thomas J, against Persels, Aaron D, represented by Abernethy, William A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2009 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFT, FOX TREE & LANDSCAPE NURSERY, INC.'S 2ND AMENDED NTC OF |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEPOSITION OF TONY MORRIS/CC |
|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLNTFS' MTN TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE/RM |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: AARON D. PERSELS |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): AARON D. PERSELS SERVED: 07/18/2009 FILED: 07/22/2009 Issue Date: 07/17/2009 File Date: 07/22/2009 Service Date: 07/18/2009 |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): AARON D. PERSELS SERVED: 07/18/2009 FILED: 07/22/2009 Issue Date: 07/17/2009 File Date: 07/22/2009 Service Date: 07/18/2009 | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by THOMAS J. HENRY Issue Date: 05/15/2009 |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT AARON D PERSELS/EA |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/EA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.