Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Osborn, Christopher D., against Keys, Wendy D, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIF O L/K/A/CC |
|
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S MTN F DEFAULT JDGMNT/CC |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/RM |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM NO SVC/RM |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): WENDY D. KEYS SERVED: Issue Date: 02/10/2009 |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CITATION (R): WENDY D. KEYS SERVED: Issue Date: 02/10/2009 | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/RM |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ SVC/RM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.