Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Palm, Mark A, against Cooper, Bonnie J, represented by Govella, Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT /GG |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PL MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (telephonic) |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT O SVC /GG |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM MARK A PALM RE; ORD SETTING TELEPHONIC HRG |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S MTN F SUMMARY JDGMNT/CC |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CCR COMPLETE ALLEN L ADKINS (MAILED) F PU/SH |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: BONNIE J. COOPER |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM NO SVC/RM |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): BONNIE J. COOPER SERVED: 01/24/2009 FILED: 01/26/2009 Served By: ALLEN CIVIL PROCESS OTH Issue Date: 12/30/2008 File Date: 01/26/2009 Service Date: 01/24/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.