Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Leslie Leighann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mondragon, Fernando P, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR NON-SUIT/DA |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ***WLKD UP BY ATTY*** |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv APPLICATN PROTECT'V ORDER (CN2): FERNANDO P. MONDRAGON SERVED: 01/06/2009 FILED: 01/07/2009 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/02/2009 File Date: 01/07/2009 Service Date: 01/06/2009 |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation APPLICATN PROTECT'V ORDER (CN2): FERNANDO P. MONDRAGON SERVED: 01/06/2009 FILED: 01/07/2009 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/02/2009 File Date: 01/07/2009 Service Date: 01/06/2009 |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TEMP EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORD AND ORD SETTING HRG |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET REQ SVC/CR |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ***ORGS WALKED TO COURT BY IRMA***/CR |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.