Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Olvera, Olga, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Guerra, Jerry, against Carlos E Torres Painting, Christus Spohn Health System Corporation, represented by Barker, F Edward, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Addressed to: Jerry Guerra/Bill of Costs |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Imaged | |
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit And Order |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Of Defendant Christus Spohn Hospital Corpus Christi's Motion For No Evidence Summary Judgment |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFT'S NO EVID MTN F SUMMARY JDGMT/CC |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SUGGESTION O DEATH/CC |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF O DEPO FRM ANTONIO GUZMAN MD /GG |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIF O DDEPOSITION/CC |
|
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): CARLOS E. TORRES PAINTING SERVED: 05/05/2009 FILED: 05/05/2009 Served By: JOE R PEREZ OTH Issue Date: 05/01/2009 File Date: 05/05/2009 Service Date: 05/05/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.