Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freeman, Amanda Sue, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Kirkman, Keith Allen, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Confirming Child Support Arrearage and Terminating Child Support | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Pre Adoptive Home Screening and Post Placement Adoptive Report |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Z - NTC/MTN of Nonsuit | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter -to IV-D Court |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reports Status Report to Court |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return Return of Service NCP (Precept) |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Precept |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.