Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vanderbilt Mortgage And Finance, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Littlefield, K. Clifford, against Gray, Pamela M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv WRIT OF POSSESSION (R): PAMELA M. GRAY SERVED: Issue Date: 06/01/2009 |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE, INC. Issue Date: 06/01/2009 |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation WRIT OF POSSESSION (R): PAMELA M. GRAY SERVED: Issue Date: 06/01/2009 |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVR LTR REQ AJ/DS |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SRVC SHEET REQ SRVC/DS |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LTR REQ WRIT OF POSSESION/RM |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ WRIT OF POSSERSION/RM |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S MTN F DEFAULT JDGMNT/CC |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CCR COMPLETE K CLIFFORD LITTLEFIELD F PU/SH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.