Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Chandonia, Val G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFT CHRISTINA MARIE GAMBLE'S MTN F SUMMARY JUDGMENT/CC |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. Issue Date: 04/11/2008 |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LTR REQ OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/ RM |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PROOF OF COURT COST AND REQ FOR PREPARATION OF ABSTRACT OF |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/ RM |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JUDGMENT/ RM |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/CC |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET NO SVC REQ/JJM |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): VAL G. CHANDONIA SERVED: 01/05/2008 FILED: 01/07/2008 Served By: BERTA ALLEN OTH Issue Date: 01/02/2008 File Date: 01/07/2008 Service Date: 01/05/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.