Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Urias, Dalia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Garcia, Gene A, against Beniquez, Wifram, Wal-Mart Stores Texas,Lp, represented by Ramirez, John A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O CHG O CHILD PLACEMENT/CC |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE/CC |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT /GG |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFTS WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LP & WILFRAM BENIQUEZ'S 2ND AMD |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIG ANS/FP |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED STIPULATION /LS |
|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFTS WAL-MART STRS TX LP & WILFRAM BENIQUEZS 1ST AMND ORG ANS |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: WAL-MART STORES TEXAS,LP |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by JOHN A. RAMIREZ Issue Date: 03/17/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.