Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Cooke, Clifton W, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. Issue Date: 06/02/2008 |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/RM |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PROOF OF COURT& COST AND REQ FOR PREPARATION OF ABSTRACT OF |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JUDGMENT/RM |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LTR/ RM |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/CC |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHT/SH |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): CLIFTON W COOKE SERVED: 01/07/2008 FILED: 01/08/2008 Served By: BERTA ALLEN OTH Issue Date: 12/28/2007 File Date: 01/08/2008 Service Date: 01/07/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.