Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Lackey, Rose, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. Issue Date: 05/19/2008 |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LTR REQ ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/RM |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PROOF OF COURT COSTS& REQ FOR PREPARATION OF ABSTRACT OF |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JUDGMENT/RM |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC FORM REQ ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/RM |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/CC |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICES/I |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F SUBS SERVICE /FP |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHT REQ NO SVC/SH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.