Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arrow Financial Services, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Regent, Anh H, against Lopez, Mario O, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE OF NON-SUIT & DISMISSAL - . |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): MARIO O. LOPEZ SERVED: 01/24/2008 FILED: 01/28/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/22/2008 File Date: 01/28/2008 Service Date: 01/24/2008 | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): MARIO O. LOPEZ SERVED: 01/24/2008 FILED: 01/28/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/22/2008 File Date: 01/28/2008 Service Date: 01/24/2008 |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFO SHEET REQ SVC/FP |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/FP |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv **MAILED SVC INFO SHTS T ATTY** |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INST SHT T CLK/SH |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.