We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Arrow Financial Services, Llc Vs. Guillen, Bentura

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago ago

On December 27, 2007 a Contract - Other case was filed by Arrow Financial Services, Llc, represented by Regent, Anh H, against Guillen, Bentura, represented by in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 27, 2007

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Nueces County, TX

Judge

Klager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Contract - Other

Matter Type

Judgment

Parties

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Case Event Conv
NTC O NON-SUIT & DISMISSAL/CC
Docket Event Case Event Conv
CITATION (PU): BENTURA GUILLEN SERVED: 01/24/2008 FILED: 01/28/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/22/2008 File Date: 01/28/2008 Service Date: 01/24/2008
Docket Event CITATION (PU): BENTURA GUILLEN SERVED: 01/24/2008 FILED: 01/28/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/22/2008 File Date: 01/28/2008 Service Date: 01/24/2008
Docket Event Case Event Conv
SVC INFO SHEET REQ SVC/FP
Docket Event Case Event Conv
CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/FP
Docket Event Hearing (OCA)
DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF
Docket Event Case Event Conv
NOTC O NON-SUIT & DISMISSAL/FP
Docket Event Case Event Conv
NOTC O NON SUIT & DISMISS /GG
Docket Event Case Event Conv
SVC INST SHT T CLK/SH
Docket Event Case Event Conv
ORIGINAL PETITION FILED
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.