Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Phelps, L, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Allison, Guy H., against Maldonado, M, represented by Maldonado, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Deeanne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Deeanne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WoE - M Maldonado |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested (Writ of Execution) |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Closing Receivership |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Application to Close Receivership |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Mtn show cause |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Receiver's Motion for Show Cause **e-filed** |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order - Agreed Order Extending T.R.O. Issued 1/16/14 Until 2/19/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.