Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Longo, Deanna L, against Adame, Betra Ek, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales Ramos, Nelva Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1901 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NON-SUIT/FP |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ORDER/CP E-FILED |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REQUEST FOR HEARING |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE TO BETRA E K ADAME EFILED/EA |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED/E-FILED - , |
|
January 01, 1901 | Docket Event |
01/01/1901 Case Event Conv CASE BALANCE UPDATED BY BOOKKEEPING 01/08/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.