Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Target National Bank Fka, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jackson, Kerry A, against Daughtry, Shelby J, represented by Hilley, Van G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales Ramos, Nelva Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S CERTIFICATE O WRITTEN DISCOVERY/CC |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTF'S CERTF O WRTN DISCVY/FP |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: SHELBY J. DAUGHTRY |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): SHELBY J. DAUGHTRY SERVED: 01/19/2008 FILED: 01/22/2008 Issue Date: 01/08/2008 File Date: 01/22/2008 Service Date: 01/19/2008 | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): SHELBY J. DAUGHTRY SERVED: 01/19/2008 FILED: 01/22/2008 Issue Date: 01/08/2008 File Date: 01/22/2008 Service Date: 01/19/2008 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET REQ SVC/JJM |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVL INFO SHEET/JJM |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.