Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Tx filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Child Support Lien (AG) | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Agreed Order To Modify Imaged |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Show Cause | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AND ORDER TO APPEAR | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Service Request Information Sheet | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding H.E.B Grocery Company |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.