Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dodeka, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klein, Joel H., against Guzman, Ricardo T, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NONSUIT W/PREJUDICE /GG |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FIAT |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF O LAST KNOWN ADDR /GG |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT O NON MILITARY STATUS /GG |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMT-CREDIT CARD /GG |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT O LIQUIDATED DAMAGES I COLLECTION CASE /GG |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT I SPT O ATTY FEE F PLT /GG |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: RICARDO T. GUZMAN |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): RICARDO T. GUZMAN SERVED: 01/18/2008 FILED: 01/23/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/08/2008 File Date: 01/23/2008 Service Date: 01/18/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.