Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REQ FOR A/J/EA |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM ATTY IN RE TO SVC FEES/EA |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFO SHEET/EA |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE OF ACTION (PLNTFS PETITION) I |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S MTN TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION/GAG |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOT FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL I; |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL /LS |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF O SEMINAR: JOHN CREEDON JR /GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.