Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales Ramos, Nelva Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT /GG |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR NONSUIT AS TO DEFTS LO ANN FERRELL AND SUSAN WELSH I |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) F.H. (prove up) |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 2ND AMD CNTRPTN F DIV /GG/GN - . |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: LO ANN FERRELL |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 4TH AMD PTN F DIV /GG/GN - . |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 5TH AMD PTN F DIV /GG/GN - . |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PTN RESPO T REPSOD MTN T STIRKE & ALT MTN T SEVER /GG |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR ORD COMPELLING DISCOVERY/CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.