Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: ERIC NEWMAN |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): ERIC NEWMAN SERVED: 12/07/2007 FILED: 12/11/2007 Issue Date: 12/07/2007 File Date: 12/11/2007 Service Date: 12/07/2007 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): ERIC NEWMAN SERVED: 12/07/2007 FILED: 12/11/2007 Issue Date: 12/07/2007 File Date: 12/11/2007 Service Date: 12/07/2007 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JM/JJM - . |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NCSO/JM/JJM - . |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY CASE INFO SHEET/JM/JJM - . |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BVS FORM/JM/JJM - . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.