Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford, Karen, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Dodson, Paul, Ford, Karen, against Torres, Le Roy, Calallen Independent School District, represented by Holmgreen, John C, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FILED |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AS PER ANGIE, DODSON'S ATTY: NO FURTHER NTC O APPEAL WILL BE |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ***PER PAUL DODSON ATTY F KAREN FORD: APPEAL ON HOLD TIL |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SETTLELMENT AGREEMENT/GC |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T WITHDRW, T SUSPEND SETTLMNT & T MDFY APPELLATE DEADLINES |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFTER HEARING APRIL 17; MAYBE THEN NTC O APPEAL WILL BE FILED |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DECLARATION O FINAL JUDGMENT/CC |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv WILL SEND CVR LTR REQUEST F DISMISSAL AS PER PHONE CALL***AG - . |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ***PER PAUL DODSON ATTY F KAREN FORD: APPEAL WAS DISMISSED; - . |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S RLE 297 NOTICE (I) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.